Kapala, Marianna Magdalene (CPSO#: 76623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 200
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 624-4531
Fax: (905) 624-2939
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.M. Kapala Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kapala ( CPSO# 76623 )

Business Address:
Suite 200
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 624-4531

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARIANNA MAGDALENE KAPALA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPALA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2006