Kaplan, Alan Glen (CPSO#: 52706)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone: (905) 883-1100
Fax: (905) 884-1195
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Canada
Phone: 905 883 1100
Fax: 905 884 1195
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alan G. Kaplan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kaplan ( CPSO# 52706 )

Business Address:
7335 Yonge Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 2B2
Phone Number: (905) 883-1100

Business Address:
14872 Yonge Street
Aurora ON  L4G 1N2
Phone Number: (905) 505-0950

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 03 Dec 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Dec 1995 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALAN GLEN KAPLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPLAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1984