Kaplan, Nikolay Semionovich (CPSO#: 78605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 02 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Karaganda State Medical Institute, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton ON  L9V 5H4
Phone: (905) 387-7777
Fax: 905-388-8805
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Limeworth Medical Centre
Suite 300
849 Upper Wentworth
Hamilton ON  L9A 5H4
Canada
Phone: 905-387-7777
Fax: 905-388-8805
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Nikolay Kaplan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 22 2009

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Apr 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2003
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 16 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 24 May 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Nikolay Semionovich Kaplan may practise medicine independently in internal
            medicine.

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 10 Nov 2009
Summary:

 
On November 10, 2009, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Kaplan committed acts of 
professional misconduct, in that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the 
practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded 
by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional; that he has been found guilty of an 
offence that is relevant to his suitability to practice; and that he failed to maintain the standard of 
practice of the profession. 
 
In October 2005, Dr. Kaplan physically assaulted a prostitute. In February 2007, Dr. Kaplan was 
found guilty of this assault, which included hitting and kicking. In September 2007, he was 
sentenced in respect of this offence. Dr. Kaplan failed to disclose the charges to the Medical 
Advisory Committee, the Credentialing Committee or the Chief of Staff at Cambridge Memorial 
Hospital, and he made a misrepresentation on his reappointment application to the Hospital for 
two consecutive years. Dr. Kaplan also failed to advise the College, when asked in writing on his 
2005 and 2006 Annual Renewal Forms, that he was facing the criminal charges described above. 
 
Furthermore, Dr. Kaplan's care and treatment of 22 patients fell below the standard of practice, 
including, but not limited to, his incomplete and inadequate documentation, management of 
hypertension, lack of follow-up with respect to abnormal lab results, and his use of certain 
combinations of anti-hypertensive medications.  
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    The Registrar impose the following term, condition and limitation on Dr. Kaplan's 
      certificate of registration: 
 
      a)    Dr. Kaplan shall successfully complete the College's Medical Record-Keeping for 
            Physicians course and the follow-up component at the earliest available date and 
            shall provide proof of same to the College upon completion. 
 
2.    The Registrar shall forthwith suspend Dr. Kaplan's certificate of registration for a period 
      of twelve (12) months. The Registrar shall suspend nine (9) months of this suspension:   
 
      a)    In consideration of the fact that Dr. Kaplan's certification of registration has been 
            effectively suspended since October 31, 2008; and  
 
      b)    On the condition that Dr. Kaplan make himself available to College staff within 
            thirty (30) days of the date of this Order to schedule his participation in the 
            Medical Ethics and Informed Consent course; and that he fully co-operate with the 
            scheduling and attendance of this course at the earliest available date.  
 
3.    Dr. Kaplan appear before the Committee to be reprimanded, with the fact of the 
      reprimand recorded on the register. 
 
 
4.    Dr. Kaplan pay costs to the College in the amount of $3,650 within ninety (90) days from 
      the date of the Order.  
 
5.    The results of this proceeding be included in the register. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 9-11 and Nov 13, Nov 23-27, 2009