Kapoor, Vimal Scott (CPSO#: 77785)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Emergency Department
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone: (905) 472-7111
Fax: (647) 776-7766
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Advisory Service
Second Floor
Toronto Police Service
40 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2J3
Canada
Phone: (416) 808-7171
Fax: (416) 808-7172
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Medical Centre
Brampton Assembly Plant, Chrysler
2000 Williams Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6S 6B3
Canada
Phone: (905) 458-2861
Fax: (905) 458-2827
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Harbourfront Medical AppleTree
8 York Street, Suite 4
Toronto, Ontario
M5J 2Y2
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Canada
Phone: (416) 366-2273
Fax: (647) 776-7766
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Patheon
2100 Syntex Court
Mississauga ON  L5N 3X4
Canada
Phone: 905-821-4001
Fax: 647-776-7766
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Medical Centre
Patheon Mississauga
2100 Syntex Court
Mississauga ON  L5N 3X4
Canada
Phone: 905-821-4001
Fax: 647-776-7766
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V.S. Kapoor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 16 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Kapoor ( CPSO# 77785 )

Business Address:
Patheon
2100 Syntex Court
Mississauga ON  L5N 3X4
Phone Number: (905) 821-4001

Business Address:
Markham - Stouffville Hospital
Emergency Department
P.O. Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3

Business Address:
Harbourfront Medical
8 York Street
Unit 4
Toronto ON  M5J 2Y2
Phone Number: (416) 366-2273

Business Address:
Chrysler/FCA
2000 Williams Parkway East
Brampton ON  L6S 6B3
Phone Number: (905) 458-2861

Business Address:
Toronto Police Service
40 College Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2J3
Phone Number: (416) 808-7171

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Markham-Stouffville,Cottage Hospital Site Uxbridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2004 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 11 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Community Medicine Effective: 21 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Occupational Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VIMAL SCOTT KAPOOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPOOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 14 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Occupational Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Occupational Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2004