Kapusta, Linda Rae (CPSO#: 58879)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Sep 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2696
Fax: (905) 813-4132
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dynacare Medical Laboratory
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Canada
Phone: (905) 790-3000
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Linda Kapusta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 31 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Kapusta ( CPSO# 58879 )

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
Suite H136
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2696

Business Address:
Gamma Dynacare Medical Lab
115 Midair Court
Brampton ON  L6T 5M3
Phone Number: (905) 790-3000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 May 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDA RAE KAPUSTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAPUSTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1987