Kara, Ali Alnoor (CPSO#: 96559)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Dec 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 107
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone: (519) 273-0100
Fax: (519) 273-0675
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Stratford General Hospital
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford, Ontario
N5A 2Y6
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Canada
Phone: (519) 272-8210
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Kara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 24 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kara ( CPSO# 96559 )

Business Address:
444 Douro Street
Stratford ON  N5A 0E6
Phone Number: (519) 273-0100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Jul 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALI ALNOOR KARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 26 Oct 2011 to 01 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 02 Aug 2013 to 28 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2014 to 28 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 29 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015