Karabegovic, Amna (CPSO#: 90816)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
North York General Hospital
RM 1NW-126
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6882
Fax: (416) 756-6151
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

100 Queensway West
Department of Emergency Medicine
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 905-848-7100
Fax: 905-804-7927
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amna Karabegovic Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Karabegovic ( CPSO# 90816 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6882

Business Address:
ER Department
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
150 York Street
14th Floor
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMNA KARABEGOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARABEGOVIC is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011