Karasik, Arthur Elliott (CPSO#: 30639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Jun 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Apr 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone: (416) 233-1271
Fax: (416) 233-3861
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arthur Karasik Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Karasik ( CPSO# 30639 )

Business Address:
202 - 190 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 5N2
Phone Number: (416) 233-1271

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARTHUR ELLIOTT KARASIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARASIK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Apr 1979