Kargel, Caroline Simone (CPSO#: 71116)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Simcoe Clinic
279 Yonge St Unit 2
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Phone: (705) 728-8860
Fax: (705) 737-4733
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Royal Victoria Regional Health Cent
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-9090
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Huronia Urgent Care Clinic
102-480 Huronia Rd.
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Canada
Phone: 7057920933
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. A. Grant and Dr. C. Kargel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Grant ( CPSO# 69401 )
Dr. C. Kargel ( CPSO# 71116 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
2 - 279 Yonge Street
Barrie ON  L4N 7T9
Phone Number: (705) 728-8860

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 08 Dec 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CAROLINE SIMONE KARGEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARGEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1999