Karr, Suzanne Marla (CPSO#: 55427)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1987

Summary

Former Name: Greenberg, Suzanne Marla (used until: 01 Oct 1986 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone: (416) 646-4455
Fax: (416) 222-5722
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Suzanne Karr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Karr ( CPSO# 55427 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
3292 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M2M 4J5
Phone Number: (416) 646-4455

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1987 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZANNE MARLA KARR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987