Karski, Jacek Maria (CPSO#: 55230)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Polish

Education:Academy of Medicine, Cracow, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN - Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-3405
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CAMH
1001 Queen Street West
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 596-7775
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2867 Ellesmere Road, Suite110
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 287-0990
Fax: (416) 287-0992
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.M. Karski Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 20 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Karski ( CPSO# 55230 )

Business Address:
Suite 110
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 287-0990

Business Address:
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3405

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JACEK MARIA KARSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARSKI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1987