Karunakaran Kutty, Patinjareparayil (CPSO#: 29096)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 1984

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam, Tamil

Education:University of Kerala, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Endoscopy Centre
10886 Hurontario Street North
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone: (905) 495-5200
Fax: (905) 495-5210
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Karunakaran Kutty Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Karunakaran Kutty ( CPSO# 29096 )

Business Address:
A7 - 10886 Hurontario Street North
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200


Corporation Name: Karunakaran Kutty Suppal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 22 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Karunakaran Kutty ( CPSO# 29096 )
Dr. P. Suppal ( CPSO# 65159 )

Business Address:
West GTA Endoscopy
Suite A-7
10886 Hurontario Street
Brampton ON  L7A 3R9
Phone Number: (905) 495-5200

Business Address:
Shoppers World Medical Centre
144 - 499 Main Street South
Brampton ON  L6Y 1N7
Phone Number: (905) 796-6570

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 28 Mar 1977 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective: 27 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATINJAREPARAYIL KARUNAKARAN KUTTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARUNAKARAN KUTTY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 May 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jan 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 1984