Kassel, Edward Earl (CPSO#: 24734)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 3-958
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-4501 Ext. 3522
Fax: (416) 946-6564
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Edward Kassel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kassel ( CPSO# 24734 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
Room 3-958
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 966-9858

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. EDWARD EARL KASSEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KASSEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Jun 1972
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1972