Katakkar, Jyoti Moira (CPSO#: 73744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: (705) 328-2817
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chandra Katakkar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chandra ( CPSO# 74901 )
Dr. J. Katakkar ( CPSO# 73744 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JYOTI MOIRA KATAKKAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATAKKAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2002