Katyal, Anil (CPSO#: 71483)

Current Status: Active Member as of 05 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jul 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 426
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 744-1211
Fax: (416) 744-2644
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Michael's Hospital
Otolaryngology Clinic
8th Floor
Cardinal Carter Wing
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5276
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M3N 1N1
Canada
Phone: (416) 242-1099
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anil Katyal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Katyal ( CPSO# 71483 )

Business Address:
426 - 2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V7
Phone Number: (416) 744-1211


Corporation Name: Rajani Adno Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 27 2010

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANIL KATYAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATYAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 04 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2002