Kay, John David (CPSO#: 60917)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Wortley Road
Suite 209
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone: (519) 667-2221
Fax: (519) 667-2001
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ambulatory Care
Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Hosp
Petrolia ON  N0N 1R0
Canada
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gerrie Kay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kay ( CPSO# 60917 )
Dr. A. Gerrie ( CPSO# 62427 )

Business Address:
209 - 190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 667-2221

Business Address:
Core Family Health
825 Richmond Street
London ON  N6A 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 963-1875

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health,Charlotte Eleanor Englehart Site Petrolia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective: 21 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN DAVID KAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1990