Kazi, Soofia Labeed (CPSO#: 81324)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 207
240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone: (519) 432-1522
Fax: (519) 432-1530
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kazi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kazi ( CPSO# 81324 )

Business Address:
207 - 240 Wharncliffe Road North
London ON  N6H 4P2
Phone Number: (519) 432-1522

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SOOFIA LABEED KAZI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KAZI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2006