Kazmi, Samina (CPSO#: 94241)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 16 Aug 2010

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Karachi, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204A
581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone: (905) 235-3912
Fax: (905) 235-4196
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Samina Kazmi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kazmi ( CPSO# 94241 )

Business Address:
204A - 581 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P6
Phone Number: (905) 235-3912

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - Florida
USA - Mississippi
USA - West Virginia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 16 Aug 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 15 Feb 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 15 Dec 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2011 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Samina Kazmi may practise medicine independently in neurology, only.