Kealey, Miles Steven (CPSO#: 67970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Oakville Medical Centre
suite 218
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: 2898637407
Fax: 2898637408
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oakville Trafalgar Memorial
Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Canada
Phone: 9058452571
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Miles Kealey Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 25 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kealey ( CPSO# 67970 )

Business Address:
North Oakville Medical Centre
Suite 218
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 4H8
Phone Number: (289) 863-7407

Business Address:
Oakville Hospital
3004 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MILES STEVEN KEALEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEALEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1999