Keating, Sarah Jane (CPSO#: 32061)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jan 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jan 1986

Summary

Former Name: Lazier, Sarah Jane (used until: 15 Aug 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
.
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone: (647)-403-8263
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah J. Keating Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Keating ( CPSO# 32061 )

Business Address:
25 Morton Shulman Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 326-5000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 12 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH JANE KEATING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEATING is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Dec 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1986