Kebede, Daniel (CPSO#: 69494)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, Bulgarian, English

Education:Medical Academy Sofia, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 303
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone: (905) 272-3131
Fax: (905) 272-8284
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Daniel Kebede Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kebede ( CPSO# 69494 )

Business Address:
Suite 303
3024 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 4M4
Phone Number: (905) 272-3131

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL KEBEDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEBEDE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1997