Keesari, Manohar (CPSO#: 33006)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1968

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Oct 1994

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Osmania University, 1962

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Durham Children's Aid Society
Children's Clinic
1320 Airport Boulevard
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 433-1551
Fax: (905) 433-0603
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

9889 Markham Rd.
Suite 211
Markham
Markham ON  L6E 0B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-9658 Ext. 215
Fax: (905) 472-7945
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keesari Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Keesari ( CPSO# 33006 )

Business Address:
Children's Clinic
Durham Children's Aid Society
1320 Airport Boulevard
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 433-1551

Business Address:
2705 - 17 Barberry Place
Toronto ON  M2K 3E2
Phone Number: (416) 730-0931

Business Address:
Markham Psychologists & Psychiatrists
211 - 9889 Hwy 48
Markham ON  L6E 0B5
Phone Number: (905) 472-9658

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANOHAR KEESARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEESARI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Feb 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Dec 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994