Keeton, Michael (CPSO#: 28988)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Keeton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 19 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 300 581 Argus Road Oakville ON L6J 3J3
Date Received: 30 May 2016

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016