Kehoe, Anne Louise (CPSO#: 56987)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jul 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carlington Community Health Centre
900 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K1Z 5Z8
Phone: (613) 722-2161
Fax: (613) 722-8471
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

TOH-Regional Cancer Centre
503 Smyth Rd
Ottawa ON  K1H 1C4
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70166
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1988 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ANNE LOUISE KEHOE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEHOE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Mar 1988
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 22 Oct 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1999