Keith, Paul Kevin (CPSO#: 57150)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
3V47-H S C
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76374
Fax: (905) 521-4971
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Firestone Chest & Allergy Unit
St. Joseph's Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 521-6000
Fax: (905) 523-5864
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Paul K. Keith Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Keith ( CPSO# 57150 )

Business Address:
McMaster University
1280 Main Street West
3V47 - HSC
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 04 Dec 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL KEVIN KEITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEITH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1986 to 14 Jun 1987
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Clinical Immunology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 1987