Kelly, Charles Patrick (CPSO#: 31147)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Sep 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 1979

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 29
1910 St Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1G 1A4
Phone: (613) 686-6656
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Pratt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 12 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pratt ( CPSO# 30645 )
Dr. C. Kelly ( CPSO# 31147 )

Business Address:
Suite 464
737 Parkdale Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 1J8
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHARLES PATRICK KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KELLY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Jun 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 1979