Kengran Sunjoh, Jude Thaddeus (CPSO#: 94517)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: Jude Thaddeus, Kengran Sunjoh (used until: 07 Mar 2012 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Russian

Education:Patrice Lumumba People's Friendship Univ, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Casselman Medical Center
629 Principale road
Casselman ON  K0A 1M0
Phone: (613) 764-5440
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Laurent Medical Centre
968 St. Laurent Blvd
Ottawa ON  K1K 3B3
Canada
Phone: (613) 789-4385
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jude Kengran Sunjoh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kengran Sunjoh ( CPSO# 94517 )

Business Address:
Casselman Medical Centre
629 Principale Road
Casselman ON  K0A 1M0
Phone Number: (613) 764-5440

Business Address:
St. Laurent Medical Centre
968 St. Laurent Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1K 3B3
Phone Number: (613) 789-4585

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jan 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDE THADDEUS KENGRAN SUNJOH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENGRAN SUNJOH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2010 to 17 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 25 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2011 to 25 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2013