Kennedy, Brent Andrew (CPSO#: 68791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 674-3181 Ext. 4733
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brent Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kennedy ( CPSO# 68791 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 675-4733

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENT ANDREW KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998