Kennedy, Karen Ann (CPSO#: 67766)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350
Fax: (855) 631-0033
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

302-85 Norfolk Street
Guelph ON  N1H 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 822-1871
Fax: 855-631-0033
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN ANN KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 1998