Kennedy, Karen Margaret (CPSO#: 58418)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 1988


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
234A Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z6
Phone: (705) 325-2487
Fax: (705) 325-1906
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aggarwal Kennedy Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Dr. K. Kennedy ( CPSO# 58418 )
Dr. R. Aggarwal ( CPSO# 58196 )

Business Address:
234A Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z6
Phone Number: (705) 325-2487

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KAREN MARGARET KENNEDY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KENNEDY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 1988