Kerr, Pauline Elizabeth (CPSO#: 70582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa Health Clinic
100 Marie-Curie Private
Ottawa, ON
K1N 6N5
Nepean ON  K2H 7B3
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Pauline Kerr Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kerr ( CPSO# 70582 )

Business Address:
Appletree Clinic
2573 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8T5
Phone Number: (613) 482-0118

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 31 Dec 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAULINE ELIZABETH KERR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 11 Mar 2002 to 05 Apr 2002
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000