Kertes, Peter John (CPSO#: 64170)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Room M1-202A
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5280
Fax: (416) 480-5323
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Vision Research Centre
340 College St.
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Department of Ophthalmology
The Hospital for Sick Children
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Peter J. Kertes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kertes ( CPSO# 64170 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook and Women's
College Health Sciences Centre
M1-202A - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER JOHN KERTES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KERTES is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1992