Kester-Greene, Nicole Maree (CPSO#: 72393)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: Kester, Nicole Maree (used until: 13 Jul 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook HSC
2075 Bayview St
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 4037
Fax: (416) 480-4704
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church St
PO Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Canada
Phone: (905) 472-7111
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kester-Greene Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Kester-Greene ( CPSO# 72393 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street
P.O. Box 1800
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NICOLE MAREE KESTER-GREENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KESTER-GREENE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005