Kevorkian, Agavni (CPSO#: 63207)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jan 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Armenian, English, Russian

Education:Erevan Medical Institute, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
24 Tullamore Drive
Toronto ON  M2L 2E8
Phone: (416) 444-0702
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr.Agavni Kevorkian Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 16 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Kevorkian ( CPSO# 63207 )

Business Address:
24 Tullamore Drive
Toronto ON  M2L 2E8
Phone Number: (416) 444-0702

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AGAVNI KEVORKIAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEVORKIAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 18 Oct 1992
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 18 Oct 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 19 Oct 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 18 Jul 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Jul 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 1999