Khakshaee, Amir Hosein (CPSO#: 87045)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University of Tehran, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
13291 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4E 4L6
Phone: 9057737759
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Amir Khakshaee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khakshaee ( CPSO# 87045 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMIR HOSEIN KHAKSHAEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAKSHAEE is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009