Khalifa, Nagib Masaud A (CPSO#: 82366)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Aug 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Aug 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
72 Victoria Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 3A1
Phone: (519) 397-0790
Fax: (519) 397-5535
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khalifa, Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Khalifa ( CPSO# 82366 )

Business Address:
72 Victoria Avenue
Chatham ON  N7L 3A1
Phone Number: (519) 401-4470

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAGIB MASAUD A KHALIFA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHALIFA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 May 2005 to 17 Jun 2005
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Jun 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011