Khamidbayev, Timur (CPSO#: 91889)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:West Kazakhstan State Medical Academy, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
395 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6E 1A2
Phone: (519) 691-0100
Fax: (519) 691-1172
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Chartwell Royalcliffe
Retirement Residence
609 Wharncliffe Rd S
London ON  N6J 2N7
Canada
Phone: (519) 963-3848
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Timur Khamidbayev Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Khamidbayev ( CPSO# 91889 )

Business Address:
395 Southdale Road East
London ON  N6A 1A2
Phone Number: (519) 691-0100

Business Address:
Chartwell Retirement Residence
609 Wharncliffe Road South
London ON  N6J 2N7
Phone Number: (519) 963-3848

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. TIMUR KHAMIDBAYEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAMIDBAYEV is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2009 to 08 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 09 Oct 2009 to 16 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 17 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 16 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Jul 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 2012