Khan, Aliya Aziz (CPSO#: 50958)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 1985

Summary

Former Name: Khan, Aliya (used until: 12 Jul 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 223
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 844-5677
Fax: (905) 844-8966
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aliya A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan ( CPSO# 50958 )

Business Address:
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 2A4
Phone Number: (905) 521-5051

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
223 - 3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 844-5677

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 30 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ALIYA AZIZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 1985