Khan, Azra (CPSO#: 66623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Ext. 2319
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Azra Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Khan ( CPSO# 66623 )

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AZRA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998