Khan, Badarunisa Begum (CPSO#: 51377)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1983

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu

Education:Osmania University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone: (416) 778-1496
Fax: (416) 778-1400
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 valley brook drive
suite 400
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Canada
Phone: 416 386 9761
Fax: 416 386 0458
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Badarunisa B. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khan ( CPSO# 51377 )

Business Address:
1496 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4J 1N4
Phone Number: (416) 778-1496

Business Address:
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
Toronto ON  M3B 2S7
Phone Number: (416) 386-9761

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 06 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BADARUNISA BEGUM KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Hospital Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993