Khan, Ehsan Ullah (CPSO#: 77248)

Current Status: Active Member as of 07 Jan 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 09 Oct 2009

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Vellore Medical Walk-in &
Cosmetic Clinic
Suite 104
3737 Major Mackenzie Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4H 0A2
Phone: (905) 417-7771
Fax: (905) 417-1377
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Walk-In Clinic of Maple
1801 Rutherford Road, Unit A5
Maple ON  L4K-5R7
Canada
Phone: 905-553-1922
Fax: 905-553-1924
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 09 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Khan ( CPSO# 77248 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
3737 Major Mackenzie Drive
Woodbridge ON  L4H 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 417-7771

Business Address:
A5
1801 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L4K 5R7
Phone Number: (905) 553-1922

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jan 2004 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2002 to 06 Jan 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 07 Jan 2003 to 06 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 2004
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Dec 2010 Active View Details [+]
            As from 11:59 p.m.,  December 6, 2010, by order of the Discipline Committee of
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the following terms,
            conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of registration held
            by Dr. Ehsan Ullah Khan:

                  a.    Dr. Khan shall be prohibited from performing liposuction unless and
                        until such time as he is approved by the College in accordance with
                        the College's Changing Scope of Practice Policy #1-08, as may be
                        amended from time to time, and any other applicable regulations,
                        guidelines or policies as may exist at the time he seeks approval;
                  
                  b.    Notwithstanding paragraph (a), Dr. Khan may surgically assist in
                        liposuction procedures on the following terms:
                  
                        1.    at a facility approved by the College in accordance with
                              Ontario Regulation 114/94 made under the Medicine Act, 1991
                              ("O/Reg. 114/94");
                  
                        2.    with a College approved Royal College certified surgeon who
                              is performing liposuction and who is in attendance for the
                              duration of the liposuction procedure performed; and
                  
                        3.    Dr. Khan shall not be the most responsible physician for any
                              patients;
                  
                  c.    Dr. Khan shall keep a log containing the names and dates of birth
                        of all patients for whom he surgically assists and the name of the
                        College approved surgeon for whom Dr. Khan is assisting.  Dr. Khan
                        shall send this log to the College at the end of each month that he
                        acts as a surgical assistant for one or more liposuction
                        procedures;
                  
                  d.    In any facility owned or operated by Dr. Khan, Dr. Khan shall be
                        prohibited from engaging in any invasive cosmetic surgical
                        procedures as defined in O/Reg. 114/94, as may be amended from time
                        to time, including hair transplants;
                  
                  e.    Dr. Khan shall not interfere with unannounced inspections by the
                        College for the purpose of determining his compliance with this
                        Order.
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  
                  

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Dec 2010
Summary:

On December 6, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Khan has committed an act of 
professional misconduct in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. 
 
Deficiencies were identified in Dr. Khan's liposuction practice pertaining to engaging in 
liposuction in an unsafe facility, failing to monitor patients before and after liposuction 
procedures and in charting deficiently. Dr. Khan failed to maintain the standard of practice of the 
profession between 2006 and 2008 in his care of five liposuction patients in each of these areas. 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
 
1.    Dr. Khan attend before the panel to be reprimanded, with the fact of the reprimand to be 
      recorded on the Register. 
 
2.    The Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Khan's 
      certificate of registration: 
   
      a.    Dr. Khan shall be prohibited from performing liposuction unless and until such 
            time as he is approved by the College in accordance with the College's Changing 
            Scope of Practice Policy #1-08, as may be amended from time to time, and any 
            other applicable regulations, guidelines or policies as may exist at the time he 
            seeks approval; 
 
      b.    Notwithstanding paragraph 2(a), Dr. Khan may surgically assist in liposuction 
            procedures on the following terms: 
 
            i.    at a facility approved by the College in accordance with Ontario 
                  Regulation 114/94 made under the Medicine Act, 1991 ("O/Reg. 114/94"); 
 
            ii.   with a College approved Royal College certified surgeon who is 
                  performing liposuction and who is in attendance for the duration of the 
                  liposuction procedure performed; and 
 
            iii.  Dr. Khan shall not be the most responsible physician for any patients; 
 
      c.    Dr. Khan shall keep a log containing the names and dates of birth of all patients 
            for whom he surgically assists and the name of the College approved surgeon for 
            whom Dr. Khan is assisting.  Dr. Khan shall send this log to the College at the 
            end of each month that he acts as a surgical assistant for one or more liposuction 
            procedures; 
 
      d.    In any facility owned or operated by Dr. Khan, Dr. Khan shall be prohibited from 
            engaging in any invasive cosmetic surgical procedures as defined in O/Reg. 
            114/94, as may be amended from time to time, including hair transplants; 
 
      e.    Dr. Khan shall not interfere with unannounced inspections by the College for the 
            purpose of determining his compliance with this Order. 
3.    Dr. Khan shall within 30 days pay the College its costs of this proceeding in the amount 
      of $3,650.00. 
 

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 6-8, December 13-14, 2010