Khan, Ghulam Zain-Ul-Din (CPSO#: 83623)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 14 Sep 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:Quaid-i-Azam University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 1B
6884 14th Ave
Markham ON  L6B 1A8
Phone: (905) 201-7773
Fax: (905) 201-4835
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Khan ( CPSO# 83623 )

Business Address:
Suite 1B
6884 14th Avenue
Markham ON  L6B 1A8
Phone Number: (905) 201-7773

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Aug 2005 to 13 Oct 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Oct 2005 to 14 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2010
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 14 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 14 Sep 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from September 14, 2017, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Ghulam Zain-Ul-Din
            Khan, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Khan to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                              DR. GHULAM ZAIN-UL-DIN KHAN
                                          ("Dr. Khan")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "ICR Committee" means the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee of
                  the College;
                  
                  "Narcotic Drugs" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made under
                  the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended.
                  
                  "Narcotic Preparations" means from the Narcotic Control Regulations made
                  under the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19, as
                  amended.
                  
                  "Controlled Drugs" means from Part G of the Food and Drug Regulations
                  under the Food and Drugs Act, S.C., 1985, c. F-27, as amended.
                  
                  "Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances" means from the
                  Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances Regulations made under the
                  Controlled Drugs and Substances Act., S.C., 1996, c. 19, as amended 
                  
                        (A summary of the above-named drugs [from Appendix I to the
                        Compendium of Pharmaceuticals and Specialties] is included in
                        Appendix "C' to this Undertaking.  The current regulatory lists are
                        included in Appendix "C' to this Undertaking.
                  
                  "All other Monitored Drugs" means as defined under the Narcotics Safety
                  and Awareness Act, 2010, S.O. 2010, c. 22, as amended, included in
                  Appendix "C" to this Undertaking.
                  
                  
                  "NMS" means the Drug Program Services Branch, the Narcotics Monitoring
                  System implemented under the Narcotics Safety and Awareness Act, 2010;

                  "OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan;
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Khan, certificate of registration number 83623, am a member of the
                  College.  The College has received information regarding my standard of
                  practice.

            (3)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that the College initiated an investigation
                  bearing File Number 7215467 (the "Investigation") into whether I engaged
                  in professional misconduct and/or am incompetent in my psychiatry
                  practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.
                  
            (5)   Practice Restrictions and Sign 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to limit the number of patients I treat each
                        day to 18 patients.  
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that I will not issue new prescriptions or
                        renew existing prescriptions for or administer:
                  
                        i.    cannabis, its preparations and derivatives; and 
                  
                        ii.   synthetic cannabinoid receptor type 1 agonists, their salts,
                              derivatives, isomers, and salts of derivatives and isomers-
                              with the exception of
                              ((3S)-2,3-dihydro-5-methyl-3-(4-morpholinylmethyl)pyrrolo[1,2,3-de]-1,4-benzoxazin-6-yl)-1-naphthalenyl-methanone
                              (WIN 55,212-3) and its salts.
                  
                        (As set out in the Narcotic Control Regulations made under the
                        Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, S.C., 1996, c. 19)
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that I shall post a sign in the waiting
                        room(s) in all my Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and
                        secure location, in the form set out at Appendix "F."  For further
                        clarity, this sign shall state as follows: 
                  
                              IMPORTANT NOTICE

                        Dr. Khan must not prescribe or administer marijuana (i.e. cannabis
                        or its preparations or derivatives)  
                  
                        Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and
                        Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to post a certified translation in any
                        language in which I provide services, of the sign described in
                        section (5)(c) above, in the waiting room(s) in all my Practice
                        Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                        set out at Appendix "F." 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to provide the certified translation(s)
                        described in section (5)(d), to the College within thirty (30) days
                        of executing this Undertaking.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that if I elect, after the execution of this
                        Undertaking, to provide services in any other language(s), I will
                        notify the College prior to providing any such services. 
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to provide to the College the certified
                        translation(s) described in section (5)(e) prior to beginning to
                        provide services in the language(s) described in section (5)(f).
                  
            (6)   Prescribing Log

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, shall keep a log of all prescriptions for Narcotic
                        Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs, Benzodiazepines and
                        Other Targeted Substances and All other Monitored Drugs, in the
                        form attached as set out in Appendix "C", which will include at
                        least the following information (the "Prescribing Log"):  
                  
                        (i)   the date of the appointment;
                        (ii)  the name of the patient and chart/file number;
                        (iii) the name of the medication prescribed, dose, direction,
                              number of tablets to be dispensed and frequency;
                        (iv)  the clinical indication;
                        (v)   whether the prescription is for a new medication and/or
                              different dose or frequency than currently prescribed to the
                              patient (Y/N); 
                        (vi)  Dr. Khan's signature;
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to keep a copy of all prescriptions I write
                        for Narcotic Drugs, Narcotic Preparations, Controlled Drugs,
                        Benzodiazepines and Other Targeted Substances and All other
                        Monitored Drugs, in the corresponding patient chart.
                  
            (7)   Clinical Supervision 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to practise under the guidance of a clinical
                        supervisor(s) acceptable to the College (the "Clinical
                        Supervisor(s)"), for twelve (12) months ("Clinical Supervision")
                        as outlined in the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking attached
                        hereto as Appendix "A", the IEP attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        and as set out below: 
                  
                        (i)   Moderate  Level Supervision
                  
                              i.    I, Dr. Khan, undertake that initially I will practise
                                    under moderate level supervision of the Clinical
                                    Supervisor ("Moderate Level Supervision"). 
                  
                              ii.   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that during the period of
                                    Moderate Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor
                                    will:
                  
                                    a.    Meet with me every two weeks to review at least
                                          twenty (20) of my patient charts, as described in
                                          further detail below. Ten (10) patient charts
                                          shall be selected from the Prescribing Log; and,
                  
                                    b.    Observe me in practice for at least one half day
                                          per month, which shall include an observation of
                                          at least one complete psychiatric assessment.
                  
                        (ii)  Low Level Supervision
                  
                              i.    I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that if my Clinical Supervisor
                                    reports to the College that satisfactory progress has
                                    been made during the period of Moderate Level
                                    Supervision, the College may, in its discretion, reduce
                                    the degree of supervision to a low level ("Low Level
                                    Supervision").
                  
                              ii.   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that during the period of Low
                                    Level Supervision, the Clinical Supervisor will:
                  
                                    a.    Meet with me at least monthly to review twenty
                                          (20) of my patient charts.  Ten (10) patient
                                          charts shall be selected from the Prescribing
                                          Log.
                  
                                    b.    Observe me in practice for one half day per
                                          month, which shall include an observation of at
                                          least one complete psychiatric assessment. 
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that, in addition to the duties set out
                        above, the Clinical Supervisor will, at minimum:
                  
                        i.    Facilitate the education program set out in the IEP attached
                              hereto as Appendix "B";
                  
                        ii.   Select the charts to review based on the educational needs
                              identified in the IEP set out at Appendix "B" to my
                              Undertaking, as well as the areas of concern identified in
                              the Medical Inspectors' Reports, and concerns that may arise
                              during the period of Clinical Supervision. 
                  
                        iii.  Discuss any concerns arising from the chart reviews and
                              observation ;
                  
                        iv.   Make recommendations to me for practice improvements and
                              ongoing professional development and inquire into my
                              compliance with the recommendations; 
                  
                        v.    Perform any other duties, such as reviewing other documents
                              or conducting interviews with staff or colleagues, that the
                              Clinical Supervisor(s) deem necessary to my Clinical
                              Supervision; and
                  
                        vi.   Submit written reports to the College at least once every
                              month, or more frequently if the Clinical Supervisor(s) has
                              concerns about my standard of practice.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to cooperate fully with the Clinical
                        Supervision of my practice, conducted under the term of this
                        Undertaking and Appendix "A" attached, and to abide by the
                        recommendations of my Clinical Supervisor(s), including but not
                        limited to, any recommended practice improvements and ongoing
                        professional development.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to ensure that Appendix "A" to this
                        Undertaking, is signed and delivered to the College within thirty
                        (30) days of the date I execute this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that if a person who has given an
                        undertaking in Appendix "A" to this Undertaking is unable or
                        unwilling to continue to fulfill its provisions, I shall, within
                        twenty (20) days of receiving notice of same, obtain an executed
                        undertaking in the same form from a similarly qualified person who
                        is acceptable to the College and ensure that it is delivered to the
                        College within that time.
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Khan, agree that if I am unable to obtain a Clinical
                        Supervisor on the provisions set out under sections (7)(e) and/or
                        (f) above, I will cease practising medicine until such time as I
                        have obtained a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College.  
                  
                  (g)   I, Dr. Khan, agree that if I am required to cease practise as a
                        result of section (7)(g) above this will constitute a term,
                        condition or limitation on my certificate of registration and that
                        term, condition or limitation will be included on the public
                        register.
                  
            (8)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to participate in and successfully complete
                        all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "B",
                        including to successfully complete at the earliest opportunity, all
                        of the following professional education (the "Professional
                        Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program(s) satisfactory to the College in: 
                  
                              1.    medical record keeping; and
                  
                              2.    www.masterpsych.com/2017-psychiatry-conference or an
                                    alternative acceptable to the College 
                  
                        (ii)  any additional professional education recommended by my
                              Clinical Supervisor(s).
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided
                        to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the
                        Professional Education.
                  
            (9)   Reassessment of Practice

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that, approximately six (6) months after the
                        completion of the Clinical Supervision set out in section (7) above
                        and Appendix "A" to this Undertaking, I will submit to a
                        reassessment of my practice ("the Reassessment") by an assessor or
                        assessors selected by the College (the "Assessor(s)").  I
                        acknowledge that the Reassessment may include a chart review,
                        direct observation of my care, interviews with colleagues and
                        co-workers, feedback from patients and any other tools deemed
                        necessary by the College.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to co-operate fully with the Reassessment,
                        conducted under the term of this Undertaking. 
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that my Clinical Supervisor(s) may receive
                        and review the findings of the Assessor(s), and may discuss with
                        the Assessor(s) any issues or concerns arising from the
                        Reassessment.  I also acknowledge that the results of the
                        Reassessment will be provided to me and reported to the College and
                        the report may form the basis of further action by the College. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that if I am of the view that any of the
                        Assessor(s)'s recommendations are unreasonable, I will have thirty
                        (30) days following my receipt of the recommendations within which
                        to provide the College with my submissions in this regard.  I
                        further acknowledge that thereafter, the ICR Committee will
                        consider my submissions and make a determination regarding whether
                        or not the recommendations, or any of them, are reasonable and if
                        so, whether they, or any of them, constitute limitations or
                        restrictions on my practice, and that decision will be provided to
                        me. 
                  
                  (e)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that, following the decision referenced in
                        section (9)(d) above, I will abide by those recommendations of the
                        Assessor(s) that the ICR Committee has determined are reasonable. 
                  
                  (f)   I, Dr. Khan, hereby consent to the following being included on the
                        public register as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                        certificate of registration, for the purposes of section 23 of the
                        Code: 
                  
                        (i)   any recommendations of the Assessor(s) which the ICR
                              Committee has identified in its decision referenced in
                              section (9)(d) as terms, conditions or limitations on my
                              practice.
                  
            (10)  Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake to inform the College of each and every
                        location that I practise or have privileges, including, but not
                        limited to, hospital(s), clinic(s) and office(s), in any
                        jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location(s)"), within five
                        (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further
                        undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice
                        Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that
                        location.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere
                        with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Location(s) and
                        patient records by a College representative for the purposes of
                        monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of OHIP,  NMS and/or any person who or
                        institution that may have relevant information, in order for the
                        College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this
                        Undertaking. 
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP and NMS
                        consent form(s), attached hereto as Appendix "D" and Appendix "E",
                        respectively. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (11)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to
                  in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (12)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible
                  for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the
                  implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

            (13)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions
                  of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in
                  reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do
                  so.

            (14)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking
                  to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at
                  any Practice Location ("Chief(s) of Staff").

            (15)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (16)  I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (17)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Khan, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (17)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                        A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Khan engaged
                        in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of
                        psychiatry. As a result of the investigation:
                  
                              *     Dr. Khan shall limit the number of patients he treats
                                    each day to 18 patients.  
                  
                              *     Dr. Khan shall not issue new prescriptions or renew
                                    existing prescriptions for or administer:
                  
                                    i.    cannabis, its preparations and derivatives; and 
                  
                                    ii.   synthetic cannabinoid receptor type 1 agonists,
                                          their salts, derivatives, isomers, and salts of
                                          derivatives and isomers- with the exception of
                                          ((3S)-2,3-dihydro-5-methyl-3-(4-morpholinylmethyl)pyrrolo[1,2,3-de]-1,4-benzoxazin-6-yl)-1-naphthalenyl-methanone
                                          (WIN 55,212-3) and its salts.
                  
                              *     Dr. Khan shall post a clearly visible sign in the
                                    waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states
                                    as follows: "Dr. Khan must not prescribe or administer
                                    marijuana (i.e. cannabis or its preparations or
                                    derivatives) Further information may be found on the
                                    College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website
                                    at www.cpso.on.ca."
                  
                              *     Dr. Khan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical
                                    Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months. 
                  
                              *     Dr. Khan will engage in professional education in
                                    medical record keeping and psychiatry.
                  
                              *     Dr. Khan's practice will be reassessed by an assessor
                                    selected by the College within 6 months of the end of
                                    the period of Clinical Supervision.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (18)  I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education and
                  to all Clinical Supervisors, and/or Assessors:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (19)  I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chief(s) of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (20)  I, Dr. Khan, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my
                  completion of the Professional Education, and to all Clinical
                  Supervisors, Chiefs of Staff and Assessors, to disclose to the College,
                  and to one another, any information:

                  (a)   relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   relevant to the provisions of the Clinical Supervisor's undertaking
                        set out at Appendix "A" to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (c)   relevant to the Reassessment;
                  
                  (d)   relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this
                        Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (e)   which comes to their attention in the course of providing the
                        Professional Education and which they reasonably believes indicates
                        a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: September 14, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Ghulam Zain-Ul-Din Khan to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective September 14, 2017:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Khan engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in the practice of psychiatry. As a result of the investigation:

Dr. Khan shall limit the number of patients he treats each day to 18 patients.

Dr. Khan shall not issue new prescriptions or renew existing prescriptions for or administer:

i. cannabis, its preparations and derivatives; and

ii. synthetic cannabinoid receptor type 1 agonists, their salts, derivatives, isomers, and salts of derivatives and isomers- with the exception of ((3S)-2,3-dihydro-5-methyl-3-(4-morpholinylmethyl)pyrrolo[1,2,3-de]-1,4-benzoxazin-6-yl)-1-naphthalenyl-methanone (WIN 55,212-3) and its salts.

Dr. Khan shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all Practice Locations, which states as follows: “Dr. Khan must not prescribe or administer marijuana (i.e. cannabis or its preparations or derivatives) Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca.”

Dr. Khan will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for 12 months.

Dr. Khan will engage in professional education in medical record keeping and psychiatry.

Dr. Khan’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within 6 months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.