Khan, Kamran Mahmood (CPSO#: 78422)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6060
Fax: (416) 864-5558
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: K. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 12 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Khan ( CPSO# 78422 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-6060

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 10 Sep 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAMRAN MAHMOOD KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Infectious Diseases

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2003