Khan, Mansoor Ahmed (CPSO#: 88411)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeride Health
Ajax Pickering Campus
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone: (905) 683-2320
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M.A. Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 17 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khan ( CPSO# 88411 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Ajax Pickering Campus
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 06 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MANSOOR AHMED KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015