Khan, Qasim Salman (CPSO#: 74951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 408
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone: (905) 618-0148
Fax: (905) 618-0178
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Qasim Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 21 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. Q. Khan ( CPSO# 74951 )

Business Address:
Suite 408
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (905) 618-0148

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. QASIM SALMAN KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2005