Khan, Raza Muhammad (CPSO#: 69176)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3H7
Phone: (519) 720-0983
Fax: (519) 720-0282
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3 wilson street east
Ancaster ON  L9G 2B3
Canada
Phone: 519 720-0983
Fax: 519 720-0282
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Raza Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 03 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Khan ( CPSO# 69176 )

Business Address:
The Harris Clinic
150 Brant Avenue
Brantford ON  N3T 3H7
Phone Number: (519) 720-0983

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Jun 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAZA MUHAMMAD KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1997