Khan, Shahida (CPSO#: 24479)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Mar 1972

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Mar 1972

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1967

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Appletree Medical Centre
Unit 102
3603 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 8W3
Phone: (647) 722-2370
Fax: (416) 367-4301
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1100 Sheppard Ave. E. Suite 100
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Canada
Phone: (416) 250-5000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shahida R. Khan Medicine Professsional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 24479 )

Business Address:
100 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
North York ON  M4K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 250-5000

Business Address:
Appletree Medical Centre
Suite 102
3603 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3R 8W3
Phone Number: (647) 722-2370

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 05 Nov 1974 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHAHIDA KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Nov 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1969
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1972