Khan, Sher Baz (CPSO#: 87566)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Nov 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Nov 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Peshawar, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
Department of Psychiatry
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill
Richmond Hill ON  L4C4Z3
Phone: 9058831212
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sher Khan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Khan ( CPSO# 87566 )

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHER BAZ KHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2008