Khandaker, Masud Hassan (CPSO#: 97619)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, French

Education:National University of Ireland, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
3rd Floor, Cardiology
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone: 905-863-2558
Fax: 905-863-2495
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton ON  L6R 2E9
Canada
Phone: 905-494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masud Khandaker Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shafi ( CPSO# 91702 )
Dr. M. Khandaker ( CPSO# 97619 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Peel Memorial Centre
20 Lynch Street
3rd Floor, Cardiology
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Phone Number: (905) 863-2558

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 2E9
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 01 Jul 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jan 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 03 Jan 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jan 2014 Active View Details [+]
                  Dr.  Masud  Hassan  Khandaker  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
                  internal medicine and cardiology, only.