Khatami, Kian (CPSO#: 83974)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jan 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jan 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: (705) 734-6284
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Khatami Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Khatami ( CPSO# 83974 )

Business Address:
203 - 480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 727-7688

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jan 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KIAN KHATAMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHATAMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2006 to 05 Apr 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 06 Apr 2006 to 16 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2007 to 16 Jan 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Apr 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2008